skip to content

Pizzale, Stephen Paul

CPSO#: 90995

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgian Cardiology Associates
125 Bell Farm Road, Suite 307
Barrie ON
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone: 705-735-1111
Fax: 705-735-1888 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Pizzale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pizzale ( CPSO# 90995 )

Business Address:
125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 735-1111

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN PAUL PIZZALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIZZALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013