skip to content

Pityk, Mykhaylo Ivanovych

CPSO#: 91275

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Chernovzy Medical Institute, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 3968
Fax: (613) 748-4938 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. M. Pityk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pityk ( CPSO# 91275 )

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MYKHAYLO IVANOVYCH PITYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PITYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014