skip to content

Pitt, Tracy Joy

CPSO#: 90216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 13 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Howard University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2291 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone: (416) 741-4545
Fax: (416) 744-1484 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 21400
Fax: (416) 242-1095
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

405-27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Canada
Phone: 416-516-4111
Fax: 416-516-1104
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

404-586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: 416-489-3273
Fax: 416-489-1510
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Pitt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Pitt ( CPSO# 90216 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6P 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
Suite 404
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Phone Number: (416) 489-3273

Business Address:
2291 Kipling Avenue
Suite 117A
Rexdale ON  M9W 4L6
Phone Number: (416) 741-4545

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:15 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 27 Feb 2009
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2014 Active
                   Dr. Tracy Joy Pitt may practise medicine independently in paediatrics and
                  clinical immunology and allergy.