skip to content

Pirzada, Nausheen

CPSO#: 85191

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4466 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Pirzada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pirzada ( CPSO# 85191 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4466


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAUSHEEN PIRZADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRZADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011