Pirvu, Adriana Mihaela (CPSO#: 99203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jan 2019

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
306-960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-7731
Fax: (416) 781-4515
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242 1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adriana Pirvu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirvu ( CPSO# 99203 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 256-7731

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 14 Jan 2019 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 14, 2019, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Adriana Mihaela
            Pirvu, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Pirvu to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ADRIANA MIHAELA PIRVU
                                          ("Dr. Pirvu")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Pirvu, certificate of registration number 99203, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1100047 (the "Investigation") into my standard of
                  practice in my family medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A",
                        including all of the following professional education (the
                        "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in medical
                              record keeping;
                  
                        (ii)  CMPA e- Modules (2)  on Medical Record Keeping;
                  
                        (iii) a program or programs satisfactory to the College in
                              psychotherapy for general physicians providing a minimum of
                              10 creditable hours;
                  
                        (iv)  a written summary of the following resources:
                  
                              1.    Investigation and Management of Hypertension,
                                    Hypertension Canada 2018 CPG:
                                    http://www.onlinecjc.ca/article/S0828-282X(18)30183-1/fulltext;
                  
                              2.    Management of Lipid Disorders
                                    http://www.cfp.ca/content/cfp/61/10/857.full.pdf;
                  
                              3.    CPSO Policy "Medical Records":
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications /Policy/
                                    Medical-Records
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake to complete the Professional Education by
                        June 1, 2019 or, if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Professional Education set out in section
                        above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the
                        Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of my
                        care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pirvu, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College.  
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Pirvu's
                              standard of practice in her family medicine practice. As a
                              result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Pirvu will engage in professional education in
                                    medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.
                  
                                    Dr. Pirvu's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the
                                    completion of the professional education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Pirvu, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Pirvu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Pirvu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Pirvu, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the
                  following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;any information
                        relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  any information which comes to their attention
                        in the course of providing the Professional Education and which
                        they reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: January 14, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Adirana Mihaela Pirvu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 14, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Pirvu’s standard of practice in her family medicine practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Pirvu will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and certain clinical issues.

Dr. Pirvu’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the completion of the professional education.