Pirani, Asif (CPSO#: 98414)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone: (416) 360-8772
Fax: 4163662413
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

333 Lakeshore Rd W #102
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Canada
Phone: (905) 274-9999
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asif Pirani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pirani ( CPSO# 98414 )

Business Address:
199 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 360-8772

Business Address:
333 Lakeshore West
Suite 102
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone Number: (905) 274-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIF PIRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2012