skip to content

Piran, Siavash

CPSO#: 95870

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Hematology
2200 Eglinton Avenue W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5331
Fax: (905) 813-3874 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Siavash Piran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Piran ( CPSO# 95870 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Hematology
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIAVASH PIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Feb 2019
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2015