skip to content

Pipkin, Mauricio

CPSO#: 96396

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidade Luterana do Brasil, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Aug 2011
PEAP - CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016