skip to content

Piper, Hannah Grace

CPSO#: 92666

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Surgery Effective:28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013