skip to content

Pinto, Robin

CPSO#: 90529

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
520 Ellesmere Rd
Malvern Medical
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone: 4162917719
Fax: 4162873775 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robin Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pinto ( CPSO# 90529 )

Business Address:
501-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Phone Number: 4162917719

Business Address:
2 Buchan Court
Toronto ON  M2J 5A3
Phone Number: (416) 756-0066

Business Address:
541 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M2R 3Y3
Phone Number: (416) 398-0555

Business Address:
1333 Neilson Road
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1H 2G7
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011