skip to content

Pinto, Hanika

CPSO#: 92854

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical Academy of Silesia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 89124 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: 416-281-7442
Fax: 416-281-7384
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Ajax-Pickering Hospital
580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320 Ext. ext14221
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANIKA PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015