skip to content

Pinto, Crystal Mary-Lou

CPSO#: 93168

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Outpatient Mental Health
5 Morrow/5 Glendale Wing
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6591
Fax: (416) 530-6076 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Canada
Phone: (416) 591-4410
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Crystal Pinto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pinto ( CPSO# 93168 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Outpatient Mental Health
5 Morrow/5 Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6591

Business Address:
Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide Street East
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone Number: (416) 591-4410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL MARY-LOU PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015