skip to content

Pinto, Andrew

CPSO#: 84694

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Centre at 410
4th Floor
410 Sherboune Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW PINTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINTO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008