skip to content

Pinkoski, Craig

CPSO#: 87129

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2009 to 17 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2010 to 17 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2011 to 17 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018