skip to content

Pineda Rivas, Maria de Los Angeles

CPSO#: 93598

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Pineda, Maria de Los Angeles (used until: 07 Feb 2016 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial St
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: 905-875-2280
Fax: 905-875-9172 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maria de Los Angeles Pineda Rivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pineda Rivas ( CPSO# 93598 )

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:16 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIA DE LOS ANGELES PINEDA RIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINEDA RIVAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Feb 2016 to 13 Mar 2016
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

McMaster University, 14 Mar 2016 to 10 Apr 2016
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Dec 2016 to 15 Jan 2017
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017