skip to content

Pinchbeck, Melanie Lynn

CPSO#: 91901

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 27 Jul 2009 to 09 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Aug 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009