Pilon, Sarah Jude (CPSO#: 101304)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
Developmental Paediatrics
325 Wellington St North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JUDE PILON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PILON is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. PILON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PILON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PILON shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PILON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PILON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Paediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019