Piggott, Katrina Lynn (CPSO#: 100890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 09 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATRINA LYNN PIGGOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGGOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2017