skip to content

Pigeon, Michel Bernard Joseph

CPSO#: 25683

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre for M H C
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2137
Fax: (705) 549-6180 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHEL BERNARD JOSEPH PIGEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIGEON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1981
Summary:

 On June 8, 1981, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Pigeon to be incapacitated and issued 
 an order.   On December 14, 2007, the Fitness to Practise Committee released Dr. Pigeon from the 
 order of June 8, 1981.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jun 1981