skip to content

Pietrus, Teresa

CPSO#: 97331

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
18 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Cres. S. Toronto, Ont M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 19 May 2022


Instructions: Patients should contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 12 Mar 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 May 2022