skip to content

Pierre, Sephora Anne-Marie

CPSO#: 85295

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French, Spanish

Education:Inst Super De Ciencias Med Villa Clara, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109-705 cotton Mills
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone: 6139329494 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sephora Anne-Marie Pierre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pierre ( CPSO# 85295 )

Business Address:
109 - 705 Cotton Mills
Cornwall ON  K6H 7K7
Phone Number: (613) 932-9494

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEPHORA ANNE-MARIE PIERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIERRE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 12 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2014