Pierce, Jacqueline Michelle (CPSO#: 99632)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 05 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014