skip to content

Piekos, Anna Maria

CPSO#: 93576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
625 Queen Street East - Unit 108
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-3063 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Piekos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Piekos ( CPSO# 93576 )

Business Address:
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Business Address:
Magenta Health
625 Queen Street East
Unit 108
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA PIEKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIEKOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012