skip to content

Pickett, Laura Emily

CPSO#: 98517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Station St
Suite 205
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone: 613-771-1910 Ext. 6
Fax: 613-707-0470 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Pickett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pickett ( CPSO# 98517 )

Business Address:
145 Station Street
Suite 205
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone Number: (613) 771-1910

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 24 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA EMILY PICKETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICKETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 24 Sep 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018