Pickell, Michael (CPSO#: 93377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room W1638
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7777
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 19, 2016
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 19, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Michael Pickell's privileges were temporarily suspended at Kingston General Hospital and Hotel Dieu Hospital, effective May 19, 2016.

In a letter dated June 1, 2016, Kingston General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Pickell's privileges had been reinstated effective June 2, 2016.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PICKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICKELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2017