skip to content

Piche, Matthew

CPSO#: 100804

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Piche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Piche ( CPSO# 100804)

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW PICHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PICHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2018