skip to content

Phuakpet, Kamon

CPSO#: 89443

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mahidol University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Sep 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012