skip to content

Phillips, Randall Noel

CPSO#: 26786

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Feb 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MedPoint Health Care Centre
Medpoint Clinics-Byron
Unit 103
1240 Commissioner's Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-4343
Fax: (519) 472-0103 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medpoint Heath Care Centre
Citi Plaza
Suite 233
355 Wellington Road
London ON  N6K 3N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medpoint Health Care Centre
West Five clinic
Suite 200
1295 Riverbend Road
London ON  N6K 0G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Randall N. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Phillips ( CPSO# 26786 )

Business Address:
MedPoint Medical Centre
Citi Plaza
Suite 233
355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Business Address:
Suite 103
1240 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-4343

Business Address:
1295 Riverbend Road
London ON  N6K 0G2
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RANDALL NOEL PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jan 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1981