skip to content

Phillips, Perry

CPSO#: 29758

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Montpellier, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. Tel: 416-398-0638
Date Received: 13 Mar 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019