skip to content

Phillips, Patrick Brian

CPSO#: 109364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Sep 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Englehart & District Hospital
61 5th St
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone: 705 544 2301
Fax: 647 362 9400 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: PATRICK PHILLIPS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phillips ( CPSO# 109364)

Business Address:
61 Fifth St
Englehart ON  P0J 1H0
Phone Number: 705 544 2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 27 Sep 2021

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Patrick Brian Phillips’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Phillips engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to his communications, including communications on social media and other digital platforms, regarding the COVID-19 pandemic and related issues. This includes making misleading, incorrect or inflammatory statements about vaccinations, treatments and public health measures for COVID-19. It is also alleged that Dr. Phillips is incompetent in relation to his communications. It is further alleged that Dr. Phillips engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in relation to posting College investigative information online and failing to remove this information upon request, and in relation to failing to cooperate with the College’s investigation.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2021 Active
 As from 11:59 p.m., September 27, 2021, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patrick Brian Phillips:  


Practice Restriction 

(1)	Dr. Phillips shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to vaccines for COVID-19;

(2)	Dr. Phillips shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to mask requirements for COVID-19; 

(3)	Dr. Phillips shall not provide medical exemptions in relation to testing for COVID-19; 

(4)	Dr. Phillips shall not prescribe ivermectin; and

(5)	Dr. Phillips shall not prescribe Fluvoxamine and Atorvastatin in relation to COVID-19. 

Posting a Sign and Translations 

(6)	Dr. Phillips shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not he is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out at Schedule "A." If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Phillips shall display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Phillips must not provide medical exemptions in relation to COVID-19 vaccines, mask requirements or testing. Dr. Phillips must not prescribe ivermectin. Dr. Phillips must not prescribe Fluvoxamine or Atorvastatin in relation to COVID-19. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".

(7)	Dr. Phillips shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides services, of the sign described in (4) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Schedule "A". 

(8)	Dr. Phillips shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (5) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

(9)	The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.

Notification of Practice Locations

(10)	Dr. Phillips shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practices including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s), office(s) and virtual care setting(s) in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at or accepting patients from that location.

Monitoring

(11)	Dr. Phillips shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Phillips' compliance with the terms of this Order.

(12)	Dr. Phillips shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.