skip to content

Phillips, Colin Robert James

CPSO#: 96023

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 18 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pain Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pain Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2017