skip to content

Phan, Eugenie

CPSO#: 98129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
Unit 108
625 Queen St E
Toronto Ont
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone: (647) 479-8410
Fax: (416) 342-1754 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

c/o SPRINT
140 Merton St
2nd Floor
Toronto Ont
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Canada
Phone: (416) 481-5099
Fax: (416) 481-2590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eugenie Phan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Phan ( CPSO# 98129 )

Business Address:
140 Merton Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M4S 1A1
Phone Number: (416) 481-5099

Business Address:
Suite 108
625 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1G7
Phone Number: (647) 479-8419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EUGENIE PHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014