skip to content

Phalpher, Prashant Nagrath

CPSO#: 86754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird st East
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58057 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Phalpher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Phalpher ( CPSO# 86754 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton, ON
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (647) 882-5194

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PRASHANT NAGRATH PHALPHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHALPHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2010