skip to content

Pg Mohd Juanda, Ak Muhd Nadzir

CPSO#: 96714

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 29 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018