skip to content

Pfaff, James Robert

CPSO#: 28585

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Dec 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Transport Canada
300-4900 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2N 6A5
Phone: (416) 952-0563
Fax: (416) 952-0569 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES ROBERT PFAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PFAFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Feb 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987