skip to content

Petrescu, Dan

CPSO#: 93098

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: 416-603-2581 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough Health Network
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough, ON
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dan Petrescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Petrescu ( CPSO# 93098 )

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAN PETRESCU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRESCU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014