skip to content

Petrera, Massimo Oronzo

CPSO#: 93334

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Bari, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NYU Langone Hospital
301 E 17th St
New York NY  10010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Italy
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2021 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MASSIMO ORONZO PETRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 16 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021