skip to content

Petrasek, Anthony

CPSO#: 14652

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain medical records may write to the following address: Attn: Dr. John Petrasek Brampton Civic Hospital W O H C 2100 Bovaird Drive East Brampton, ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 28 Oct 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2010