Petrariu, Alina Maria (CPSO#: 99556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KIRKLAND LAKE FAMILY HEALTH TEAM
2 WATER STREET
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone: 705-567-2224
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A M Petrariu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrariu ( CPSO# 99556 )

Business Address:
145 Government Road West
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Business Address:
Kirkland Lake Family Health Team
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINA MARIA PETRARIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRARIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 23 Oct 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2014 to 09 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015