skip to content

Peters, Judy Ann

CPSO#: 88176

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
2251 Lawrence Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2P5
Phone: (877) 406-9362
Fax: (877) 792-5201 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Mar 2008 to 04 Apr 2008
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active
             Dr. Judy Ann Peters may practise medicine independently in family medicine.