skip to content

Pesin, Nataly

CPSO#: 91024

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Weizblit, Nataly (used until: 26 Oct 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404-1110 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: 416 572 5955
Fax: 416 572 5959 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Vision and Research Cent
Suite 600
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-6607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nataly Pesin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Pesin ( CPSO# 91024 )

Business Address:
North Toronto Eye Care
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
Suite 301
801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 748-8377

Business Address:
Suite 600
340 College Street
Kensington Eye Institute, Suite 600, 340 College S
Toronto ON  M5T A9

Business Address:
1110 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 404
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: 416 572 5955

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATALY PESIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PESIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015