skip to content

Persaud, William Milton

CPSO#: 23745

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005