skip to content

Persad, Vashti Chanardaye

CPSO#: 97105

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone: (905) 826-1164
Fax: (905) 826-1214 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Vashti Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad ( CPSO# 97105 )

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
Unit 8
5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Business Address:
1742 Bristol Road West
Mississauga ON  L5M 1X9
Phone Number: (905) 826-3045

Business Address:
1060 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga ON  L4W 1K3
Phone Number: (905) 624-1511

Business Address:
2930 Erin Centre Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 7M4
Phone Number: (905) 569-7155


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Persad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Persad ( CPSO# 97105 )

Business Address:
Streetsville Medical Centre
8 - 5425 Creditview Road
Mississauga ON  L5V 2P3
Phone Number: (905) 826-1164

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VASHTI CHANARDAYE PERSAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 19 Dec 2011 to 01 Jan 2012
EL - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012