skip to content

Perron, Lygia Beatriz Carvalho

CPSO#: 87105

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 12 Feb 2017
EL - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2017