Perrier, Catherine Elizabeth (CPSO#: 101015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: Lowes, Catherine Elizabeth (used until: 25 Jul 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dundas East Medical Centre
4-600 Dundas St E
Belleville ON  K8N 5P9
Phone: (613) 779-8869
Fax: (613) 480-0255
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.E. Perrier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Perrier ( CPSO# 101015)

Business Address:
Dundas East Medical Clinic
600 Dundas Street East
Suite 4
Belleville ON  K8N 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 779-8869

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELIZABETH PERRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 30 Jan 2016 to 04 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2016