skip to content

Perlis, Nathan

CPSO#: 88943

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Urology
3-130 610 University Avenue
M5G2M9
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-2957
Fax: 416-946-6590 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nathan Perlis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Perlis ( CPSO# 88943 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Surgical Oncology
610 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
University Urology Associates Clinic
123 Edward Street
Suite 1401
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 979-9000

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
Suite 6-821
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATHAN PERLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERLIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015