skip to content

Perez Falero, Raul Andres

CPSO#: 89832

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2010