skip to content

Perez, Edgardo Luis

CPSO#: 31284

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:State Univ of New York, Downstate, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512 Ace st
Stittsville ON  K2V 0G1
Phone: (613)4353019
Fax: (613) 435-3702 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Edgardo Perez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Perez ( CPSO# 31284 )

Business Address:
512 Ace Street
Stittsville ON  K2V 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 435-3019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Arizona

USA - California

USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDGARDO LUIS PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980