First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 May 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |