skip to content

Perera, Kanjana Sasipriya

CPSO#: 89179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC - General Site
C4-106
30 Copeland Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40367
Fax: (905) 577-1427 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kanjana Perera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Perera ( CPSO# 89179 )

Business Address:
HHSC - General Site
PHRI
Copeland Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KANJANA SASIPRIYA PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013